U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10146
  • Case Name: Esteban Ariel Valera Baez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order Discharging Trustee/Closing Case]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)(Auto)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.