U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-30007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Skiba
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Government Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 10, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Pretrial Services/Probation - Request/Memo/Summons/Warrant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.