U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-30169
  • Case Name: Michelle Marie Ransom
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Miscellaneous Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Objection]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion To Limit/Shorten Notice]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Approve]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Compromise]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Limit/Shorten Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.