U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40795
  • Case Name: Thiago Calmon Sathler and Carolina Luchi Batista
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order Discharging Trustee/Closing Case]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order Discharging Debtor Ch. 7]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order To Set Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.