open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:3:19-cv-11276
    Party Name:Curis Corporation, et al v. AmGuard Insurance Company
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text-Only Order]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear*]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?338244
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =