open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:19-31655-jda
    Party Name:Sharan D Magee
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Corcoran, Collene K. [Minute Entry. Order to Show Cause Dissolved]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Corcoran, Collene K. [Certificate of Final Installment/Fees Paid/Bar Debtor (virtual)]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Corcoran, Collene K. [none]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Corcoran, Collene K. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (BATCH)]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Corcoran, Collene K. [Certificate of Service (batch)]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Corcoran, Collene K. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Corcoran, Collene K. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [Notice of Voluntary Conversion from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [Striking Document (text)]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [Convert Case 13 to 7]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [Show Cause on Dismissal of Case for Failure to Pay]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [Adjourn/Reschedule/Continue Hearing]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [none]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [Chapter 13 Installment Payment]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [Stipulation(batch)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (BK)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [Debtor's Chapter 13 Confirmation Hearing Certificate]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [Notice of Withdrawal]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [Amended Chapter 13 Plan - Pre Confirmation]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (order)]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [Certificate of Service(batch)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [Payment Order]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [Creditor Request for Notice]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [Chapter 13 Case Management Order]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bekofske, Carl [Flags Set CASECHECKED]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mieb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?917237
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =