open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:19-cv-12389
    Party Name:Saoud et al v. Everest Indemnity Insurance Company
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer - Free]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Counterclaim]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?340839
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =