open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:4:19-cv-12659
    Party Name:Pecherkiewicz v. Oakland County et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text-Only Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint, Amended]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear*]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appearance]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response - Free]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?341533
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =