open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:19-cv-13295
    Party Name:Williams v. City of Detroit
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice - Other]
    Date Published:February 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Time to - Free]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?343023
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =