open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:20-40803-mar
    Party Name:Bradley Day
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carroll, Krispen S. [.]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carroll, Krispen S. [Minute Entry. Motion Granted]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carroll, Krispen S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carroll, Krispen S. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carroll, Krispen S. [Notice of Hearing (BK)]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carroll, Krispen S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carroll, Krispen S. [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carroll, Krispen S. [Payment Order]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carroll, Krispen S. [Chapter 13 Case Management Order]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carroll, Krispen S. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carroll, Krispen S. [Creditor Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carroll, Krispen S. [Flags Set CASECHECKED]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mieb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?929198
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =