open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:1:20-cv-10391
    Party Name:United States of America v. Personal Property ASUS laptop, model: U52FBBL9, serial A9N0A5678299393 et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
    Date Published:June 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default*]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Clerks Entry of Default]
    Date Published:May 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?345098
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =