open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:3:20-cv-12129
    Party Name:Reed-Pratt v. Winfrey et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit*]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File]
    Date Published:September 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text-Only Order]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint, Amended]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Show Cause]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing on Motion*]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Temporary Restraining Order]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?348462
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =