U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30314-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Dennison
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Merged Case]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • July 26, 2022: [Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • July 25, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 25, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • July 25, 2022: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • July 25, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • July 22, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.