U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mc-51300
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Sills
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion - Free]
  • October 04, 2022: [Motion - Free]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Substitution/Withdrawal of Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 23, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 15, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Initiating Motion from Misc. Case]
  • August 10, 2022: [Misc. Case - Initiating Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.