U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30342-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Childs
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Merged Case]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Correction]
  • August 24, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 18, 2022: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • August 12, 2022: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • August 12, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • August 12, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • August 12, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.