U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30501-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Leeds
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Adjourn]
  • January 24, 2023: [Adjourn]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Adjourn]
  • December 29, 2022: [Adjourn]
  • December 08, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 08, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • December 08, 2022: [Error]
  • December 08, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2022: [Unseal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.