U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30535-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. McIlwain
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Merged Case]
  • January 05, 2023: [Petition and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 29, 2022: [Pretrial Services Form 8]
  • December 28, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 27, 2022: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • December 27, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • December 27, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • December 20, 2022: [Petition and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 19, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.