U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-20203-2
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Currie et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 02, 2025: [Strike]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Reduce Sentence ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Return of Property]
  • April 29, 2025: [Text-Only Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion - Free]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Stipulation and Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Stipulation and Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.