U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Ends of Justice Continuance]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Protective Order ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Setting Pretrial and Jury Trial]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Scheduling Progression of Case]
  • March 17, 2025: [Rule 5(f) Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 11, 2025: [Petition and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.