U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ruiz-Chavez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice Cancelling Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing (Initial Pretrial Matters)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing (All)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Bond and Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing (Initial Pretrial Matters)]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.