U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-11195
  • Case Name: Hendrix v. Olympia Entertainment, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Text-Only Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Appear*]
  • April 30, 2025: [Withdraw Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 28, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 27, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.