U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Minnesota

minnesota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Minnesota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 15-32141
  • Case Name: Ernest Donald Atchison, Sr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Close bankruptcy case]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Final report and account of Chapter 13 trustee]
June, 2016
  • June 12, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 10, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Order dismissing case]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Minutes re: Ch 13]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Motion to dismiss for failure to make plan payments]
August, 2015
  • August 30, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 16, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Modified chapter 13 plan (Preconfirmation)]
  • July 30, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Amended schedules and statements (fee for schedules D E and F)]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice of change of address]
  • June 16, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
  • June 07, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.