Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-30762
    Party Name:NABEEL MAHDI BENALSHAIKH
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Close bankruptcy case]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Final report and account of Chapter 13 trustee]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Order dismissing case for failure to file required documents under 521(i)]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Order on partial case filing]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Notice of important information for pro se debtors]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Voluntary chapter 13 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?456559
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =