open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-31236
    Party Name:JUSTINE MARIE RUPPERT
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Amended schedules and statements (fee for schedules D and E/F)]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Notice of change of address]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Reaffirmation agreement]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Meeting of creditors concluded - chapter 7 case]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [none]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Third party guaranty for payment of attorney fees]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?457720
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =