open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-04158
    Party Name:Manty v. Allure Energy, Inc.
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [MNB Order for trial]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice]
    Date Published:August 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [MNB Answer to complaint]
    Date Published:August 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [MNB Order (Generic)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [MNB Stipulation or agreement]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [MNB Certificate of service]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [MNB Summons for adversary proceeding]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto)]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: [MNB Complaint (fee)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?459372
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =