U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:94-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Usry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 07, 2024: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • February 18, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • July 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 19, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • July 19, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Remark]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 16, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 21, 2020: [Bond]
  • January 21, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • January 21, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 16, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 16, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 15, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • July 30, 2019: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 01, 2019: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 15, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
  • September 04, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • March 22, 2017: [Response]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 21, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.