U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-00141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Turner et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Response to Order]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Writ of Certiorari Denied - Supreme Court]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • October 15, 2021: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 02, 2021: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • April 02, 2021: [Judgment - 2255]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • March 31, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • January 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 01, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Order Epps Successive]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • October 13, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • October 06, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • October 06, 2017: [Restricted Docket Entry (Court Users Only)]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 06, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 29, 2017: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 29, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Reply to Response]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 12, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 12, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Response]
  • April 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 26, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Response to Order]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 02, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Letter]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 24, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Letter]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.