U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bain
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • February 05, 2018: [Clarify]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Remark]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • November 18, 2016: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • July 14, 2016: [Transcript - Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.