U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cr-00001-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Porter et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 11, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • March 07, 2022: [Restricted Document]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • March 07, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • February 25, 2022: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2022: [Remark]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Mail Returned]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 19, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • November 04, 2021: [Reply to Response]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 01, 2021: [Restricted Document]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • October 01, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • September 21, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 20, 2021: [Change of Address]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Letter]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Letter]
  • March 25, 2019: [Letter]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Order]
  • March 24, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • August 15, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.