U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Collins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Restricted Document]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 18, 2022: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 24, 2022: [Remark]
  • October 24, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • October 24, 2022: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Restricted Document]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • October 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal or Restrict]
  • September 02, 2021: [Seal or Restrict]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 09, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 25, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • August 30, 2016: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.