U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hand
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 02, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 17, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • September 17, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 17, 2020: [Unseal Document]
  • September 17, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 17, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
January, 2018
  • January 14, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 22, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 22, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 23, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 17, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order]
  • November 10, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 01, 2016: [Waiver]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 01, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 01, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 01, 2016: [Arraignment]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer]
  • October 31, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.