open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

MISSISSIPPI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00839
    Party Name:Keenum v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Deadline]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [State Court Record]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?106279
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =