open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

MISSISSIPPI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:4:04-cr-00020-2
    Party Name:USA v. Stephens et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Revocation]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Temporary Detention]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?41145
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =