U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 28, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 24, 2025: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • April 24, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 18, 2025: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • April 14, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 02, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
October, 2024
  • October 28, 2024: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.