U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rhodes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 18, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • April 08, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 21, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
November, 2024
  • November 20, 2024: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.