U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Canseco-Ramirez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 18, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
December, 2024
  • December 09, 2024: [Docket Annotation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.