U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00072
  • Case Name: Smith et al v. Bailey et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 15, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • April 30, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
February, 2025
  • February 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.