U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00029
  • Case Name: Heirs of SL Gene Thompson v. Estate of Mary Alice Cabibi Thompson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2025
  • February 04, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.