U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00351
  • Case Name: Evanston Insurance Company v. Hua et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Set Aside Default]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set Aside Default]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 07, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 02, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 01, 2025: [Entry of Default]
February, 2025
  • February 06, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.