U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 29, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 19, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 14, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 13, 2025: [Continue]
February, 2025
  • February 17, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.