U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00115
  • Case Name: Necaise v. Bay St. Louis-Waveland School District
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • April 01, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
  • March 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 11, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.