U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00103
  • Case Name: Calvin v. DeJoy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • May 13, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • May 07, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 30, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 20, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 19, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.