U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00028
  • Case Name: Phillips v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 18, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 17, 2025: [Joinder (Adding Necessary Party)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 01, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Remand]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.