U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00072
  • Case Name: Freemantle-Brackett v. LVNV Funding, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 15, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • May 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 15, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 11, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Remark]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 14, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.