U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00757
  • Case Name: TWCI Consulting, LLC. et al v. Clark, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • April 07, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.