U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00029
  • Case Name: Sanders v. SharkNinja Operating, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • April 15, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
  • April 15, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • April 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.