U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00479
  • Case Name: Small v. Central Transport LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • April 07, 2025: [Amended Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 19, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.