U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00098
  • Case Name: Powell v. City of McComb
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Receipt of Deposition]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.