U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00362
  • Case Name: Jenkins v. Liberty Insurance Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 23, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 23, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.