U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00815
  • Case Name: Powell v. Henderson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 09, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • May 09, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 02, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Staying Discovery]
  • March 31, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
  • March 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.